WI AB856 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 46.2895 (2); to amend 46.2895 (3) (b) 5. and 46.2895 (13); and to create 46.284 (2) (br), 46.284 (4m), 46.2895 (2) (b), 46.2895 (2) (c), 46.2895 (3) (e), 46.2895 (4) (o), 46.2895 (4) (p), 46.2895 (4) (q), 46.2895 (4) (r), 46.2895 (4r) and 46.2895 (6) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: long-term care districts and care management organizations. (FE)
Title
Long-term care districts and care management organizations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:06 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab856 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB856.pdf |