WI AB849 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.52 (3) (d); to renumber and amend 118.52 (4); to amend 115.28 (54m), 115.38 (1) (d), 115.385 (4), 118.52 (1) (e), 118.52 (2), 118.52 (3) (a), 118.52 (3) (b), 118.52 (3) (c), 118.52 (3) (e), 118.52 (5), 118.52 (6), 118.52 (8), 118.52 (9), 118.52 (10), 118.52 (11), 118.52 (12) and 118.57 (1); to repeal and recreate 118.52 (title); and to create 118.52 (1) (ad), 118.52 (1) (af), 118.52 (1) (ah), 118.52 (2m) and 118.52 (13) of the statutes; Relating to: expanding the part-time open enrollment program. (FE)
Title
Expanding the part-time open enrollment program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Education and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:08 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 6 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab849 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB849.pdf |