WI AB848 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: modifying rules of the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System regarding service of notice, updating outdated rules of the board, and providing for consistent capitalization of certain terms in the board's rules.
Title
Modifying rules of the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System regarding service of notice, updating outdated rules of the board, and providing for consistent capitalization of certain terms in the board's rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 330 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Risser, Miller, Vinehout, Harris Dodd, Ringhand, C. Larson, Carpenter, Wirch, Lassa and L. Taylor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Universities and Technical Colleges and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:05 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced |