WI AB847 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.395 (4) (fq), 20.395 (4) (fv), 20.395 (4) (fx) and 85.53 of the statutes; Relating to: an electric vehicle infrastructure program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
An electric vehicle infrastructure program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-22 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2024-02-21 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:34 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2024-01-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-12-27 | House | Representative Green added as a coauthor |
2023-12-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2023-12-22 | House | Introduced |