WI AB842 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.435 (1) (q); and to create 20.285 (1) (sr), 20.370 (4) (as), 20.370 (4) (ax), 20.370 (4) (ay), 20.370 (4) (az) and 20.370 (6) (es) of the statutes; Relating to: providing funding related to PFAS programs and positions, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Providing funding related to PFAS programs and positions, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-13 | House | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Gruszynski added as a coauthor |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab842 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB842.pdf |