WI AB84 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-14 - Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tauchen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 115.3415 of the statutes; Relating to: imposing requirements related to school lunch and breakfast programs in certain schools. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposing requirements related to school lunch and breakfast programs in certain schools. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-14HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tauchen
2019-05-30HousePublic hearing held
2019-05-21HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2019-05-08HouseRepresentative Pope withdrawn as a coauthor
2019-03-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-19HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback