WI AB839 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 809.30 (2) (d), 885.10, 938.32 (5) (title), 977.02 (3) (intro.), 977.05 (4) (g), 977.05 (4) (gm), 977.05 (4) (h), 977.06 (1) (d), 977.06 (2) (a), 977.06 (2) (am), 977.07 (1) (a), 977.07 (1) (c) and 977.07 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: the determination of indigency prior to the state public defender appointing an attorney to represent a parent in a proceeding under chapters 48 and 938, the description of defendant indigency for public defender fees, and recusal from juvenile justice proceedings (suggested as remedial legislation by the State Public Defender). (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The determination of indigency prior to the state public defender appointing an attorney to represent a parent in a proceeding under chapters 48 and 938, the description of defendant indigency for public defender fees, and recusal from juvenile justice proceedings (suggested as remedial legislation by the State Public Defender). (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-01-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-01-24SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-01-23HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-23HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-01-23HouseRules suspended
2018-01-23HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-23HouseRead a second time
2018-01-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-01-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-01-18HousePlaced on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-01-16HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback