WI AB839 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Published 4-27-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Published 4-27-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 343.301 (1g) and 343.301 (2m); to amend 303.08 (10r), 343.10 (2) (f) and 343.10 (5) (a) 3.; and to create 343.301 (1g) (am) and 343.301 (2m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in a sobriety program. (FE)
Title
Participation in a sobriety program. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] |
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Published 4-27-2016 |
2016-04-26 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-26-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 389 |
2016-04-21 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | LRB correction |
2016-03-24 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:02 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Schraa |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced |