WI AB838 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Representative Mason added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Representative Mason added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend chapter 40 (title); and to create 15.07 (1) (a) 6., 15.165 (5), 20.515 (1) (k), 20.515 (2), 25.17 (1) (yu), 25.17 (2) (fm), 25.52 and subchapter X of chapter 40 [precedes 40.99] of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a private retirement security plan and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creation of a private retirement security plan and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Representative Mason added as a coauthor |
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab838 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB838.pdf |