WI AB837 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 19.35 (3) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: fees for redacting certain records of law enforcement agencies. (FE)
Title
Fees for redacting certain records of law enforcement agencies. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2024-02-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2024-02-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2024-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spiros |
2024-01-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-18 | House | Representative Plumer added as a coauthor |
2024-01-18 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Government Accountability and Oversight and referred to committee on State Affairs pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2024-01-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-11 | House | Representative Michalski added as a coauthor |
2024-01-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2024-01-02 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2023-12-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2023-12-22 | House | Introduced |