WI AB834 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 446.02 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the score required for successful completion of chiropractic examinations.
Title
The score required for successful completion of chiropractic examinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 288 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:53 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hutton, Jacque and Kooyenga |
2018-01-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced |