WI AB831 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 111.31 (1), 111.31 (2), 111.31 (3), 111.321 and 111.322 (intro.); and to create 111.32 (2r), 111.32 (12j), 111.32 (12p) and 111.365 of the statutes; relating to: prohibiting discrimination against an employee who declines to attend an employer-sponsored meeting or to participate in any communication with the employer or with an agent, representative, or designee of the employer, the primary purpose of which is to communicate the opinion of the employer about religious or political matters.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination against an employee who declines to attend an employer-sponsored meeting or to participate in any communication with the employer or with an agent, representative, or designee of the employer, the primary purpose of which is to communicate the opinion of the employer about religious or political matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-12 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-31 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-29 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab831 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB831.pdf |