WI AB830 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.410 (1) (a), 20.410 (1) (ab), 302.05 (title), 302.05 (1) (am) (intro.), 302.05 (1) (b), 302.05 (2), 302.05 (3) (b), 302.05 (3) (c) 2. (intro.) and 302.05 (3) (d); and to create 20.410 (1) (ki), 302.05 (1) (c) and 302.05 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: earned release upon the completion of a training program, reporting on the aging and elderly prison population, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Earned release upon the completion of a training program, reporting on the aging and elderly prison population, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab830 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB830.pdf |