WI AB828 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 101.63 (1) (intro.) and 101.73 (1); and to create 101.02 (15m) of the statutes; Relating to: the use of radon-resistant construction materials and techniques in new construction of public buildings, places of employment, one-family and two-family dwellings, and modular homes and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The use of radon-resistant construction materials and techniques in new construction of public buildings, places of employment, one-family and two-family dwellings, and modular homes and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab828 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB828.pdf |