WI AB824 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 973.01 (2) (c) 2. a.; and to create 940.20 (2n) of the statutes; Relating to: battery of a corrections employee by a person in custody and providing a penalty.
Title
Battery of a corrections employee by a person in custody and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-08 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 58, Noes 34 |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 6, Noes 4 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2022-01-07 | House | Introduced |