WI AB824 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 346.14 (1); to amend 346.02 (10) and 346.02 (11); and to create 346.14 (1b) and 346.14 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: distances between motor vehicles.
Title
Distances between motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:50 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2018-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab824 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB824.pdf |