WI AB820 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.08 of the statutes; Relating to: the standard of proof required to effect a temporary or permanent closure of a sport shooting range based on an unsafe condition.
Title
The standard of proof required to effect a temporary or permanent closure of a sport shooting range based on an unsafe condition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 179 |
2018-03-27 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-27-2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 21, Noes 11 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:11 PM on 2-15-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2018-02-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Stafsholt |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2018-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stafsholt |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2018-01-08 | House | Introduced |