WI AB82 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Published 3-30-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 118.2935 of the statutes; Relating to: information about sudden cardiac arrest during youth athletic activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information about sudden cardiac arrest during youth athletic activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-29HousePublished 3-30-2022
2022-03-29HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-29-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 210
2022-03-28HousePresented to the Governor on 3-28-2022
2022-03-10HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-10-2022
2022-03-09HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2022-03-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2022-03-08SenateSenator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
2022-03-08SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2022-03-08SenateRules suspended
2022-03-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2022-03-08SenateRead a second time
2022-03-04SenatePlaced on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2022-03-04SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2022-02-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2022-02-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2022-02-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2022-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2022-02-22HouseRepresentative Vining added as a coauthor
2022-02-22HouseRead a third time and passed
2022-02-22HouseRules suspended
2022-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2022-02-22HouseAssembly Amendment 4 adopted
2022-02-22HouseRead a second time
2022-02-17HousePlaced on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules
2022-02-17HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2022-02-17HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2022-02-17HouseReport Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2022-02-10HouseExecutive action taken
2022-02-07HouseAssembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Allen
2022-01-26HouseRepresentative Kurtz added as a coauthor
2022-01-18HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Allen
2022-01-07HouseRepresentative Drake added as a coauthor
2022-01-06HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a coauthor
2021-11-10HouseRepresentative Behnke added as a coauthor
2021-11-09HouseRepresentative Tranel added as a coauthor
2021-11-02HouseLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
2021-11-01HouseRepresentative Rozar withdrawn as a coauthor
2021-10-29HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
2021-06-15HouseRepresentative Wittke withdrawn as a coauthor
2021-06-15HouseRepresentative Ramthun added as a coauthor
2021-06-15HousePublic hearing held
2021-06-04HouseRepresentative Andraca added as a coauthor
2021-05-26HouseRepresentative L. Myers added as a coauthor
2021-03-24HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Allen
2021-03-24HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen
2021-03-05HouseRepresentative S. Rodriguez added as a coauthor
2021-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab82
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AB82.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/AB82.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2021/210.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB82-AA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB82-AA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB82-ASA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB82-AA3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB82-AA4.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/assembly/education/1660679.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/AB82.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcactmemos/2021/REG/Act%20210.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback