WI AB82 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.99 (4), 440.997 (2), 440.997 (3) and 440.997 (5); to renumber 440.994 (2) (a); to renumber and amend 440.9945 (1); to amend 440.99 (6), 440.99 (7), 440.99 (11), 440.991 (2) (b), 440.9915 (title), 440.9915 (1) (intro.), 440.9915 (1) (a), 440.9915 (1) (b), 440.9915 (1) (c), 440.9915 (1) (e), 440.9915 (1) (f), 440.9915 (1) (h), 440.9915 (1) (i), 440.9915 (1) (j), 440.9915 (1) (k), 440.9915 (1) (L), 440.992 (1), 440.992 (2) (intro.), 440.992 (2) (e), 440.992 (2) (f), 440.992 (2) (g), 440.992 (4), 440.9925 (1), 440.9925 (2), 440.994 (1), 440.994 (2) (intro.), 440.994 (3), 440.994 (4), 440.994 (5), 440.9945 (2), 440.995 (1), 440.995 (2), 440.995 (3), 440.9955 (1) (intro.), 440.9955 (1) (b), 440.9955 (1) (c), 440.9955 (2), 440.996 (1) (intro.), 440.996 (2) (intro.), 440.996 (2) (a), 440.996 (2) (b), 440.996 (2) (g), 440.997 (1), 440.9975 and 440.998; to repeal and recreate 440.99 (2), 440.9915 (2), 440.992 (5) and 440.9985; and to create 440.99 (4r), 440.99 (5d), 440.99 (6c), 440.99 (6r), 440.99 (8c), 440.99 (9m), 440.9915 (1) (bm), 440.9915 (1) (gm), 440.9915 (1) (he), 440.9915 (1) (hm), 440.9915 (1) (hs), 440.9915 (1) (m), 440.9915 (1) (n), 440.9915 (1) (o), 440.9925 (1m), 440.994 (2) (ag), 440.994 (3m), 440.994 (6), 440.9945 (1g), 440.9945 (3), 440.9945 (4), 440.9945 (5), 440.9945 (6), 440.9945 (7), 440.9945 (8), 440.997 (2m) and 440.997 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: adopting revisions to the state's uniform athlete agents act and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Adopting revisions to the state's uniform athlete agents act and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] |
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2019-08-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-04-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab82 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB82.pdf |