WI AB82 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.164 (3m) (title); and to create 29.164 (3m) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: an exemption for resident disabled veterans and for recipients of the purple heart medal from the cumulative preference system for issuing wild turkey hunting licenses and tags.
Title
An exemption for resident disabled veterans and for recipients of the purple heart medal from the cumulative preference system for issuing wild turkey hunting licenses and tags.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-10 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-15 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab82 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB82.pdf |