WI AB818 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (4) (bi); and to create 23.321, 23.323, 59.691, 60.625, 61.352, 62.232 and 101.02 (23) of the statutes; relating to: notices concerning construction near or on lakes, streams, or wetlands that are given to applicants for building permits and other construction approvals, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to furnish informational brochures about wetlands laws, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to provide evaluations and statements about whether certain land contains wetlands, and making an appropriation.
Title
Notices concerning construction near or on lakes, streams, or wetlands that are given to applicants for building permits and other construction approvals, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to furnish informational brochures about wetlands laws, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to provide evaluations and statements about whether certain land contains wetlands, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-08 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-30 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies | |
2010-03-25 | LRB correction | |
2010-03-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-23 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab818 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB818.pdf |