WI AB813 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 440.03 (13) (br) of the statutes; Relating to: investigations of conviction records by the department of safety and professional services for purposes of determining eligibility for credentials, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Title
Investigations of conviction records by the department of safety and professional services for purposes of determining eligibility for credentials, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-31 | House | Representative Spiros added as a coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab813 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB813.pdf |