WI AB810 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 343.301 (1g) (a) 2. a. of the statutes; Relating to: restricting a person's operating privilege to vehicles equipped with an ignition interlock device. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricting a person's operating privilege to vehicles equipped with an ignition interlock device. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-01-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2022-01-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2022-01-06HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
2022-01-06HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback