WI AB810 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 115.28 (13); to amend 115.28 (13) (title), 115.30 (1), 118.38 (1) (a) 6. and 121.05 (1) (c); and to create 115.28 (13) (b) and (c) and 120.18 (1) (p) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a computerized uniform school budget and accounting system. (FE)
Title
Creating a computerized uniform school budget and accounting system. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Education and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:58 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-27 | House | Representative Nygren added as a coauthor |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab810 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB810.pdf |