WI AB81 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 343.52 (1m); to amend 343.52 (1) (a) and (b); and to create 343.52 (1m) (a), (b) and (c) of the statutes; relating to: special identification cards issued by the Department of Transportation providing parking privileges for persons with physical disabilities and providing a penalty.
Title
Special identification cards issued by the Department of Transportation providing parking privileges for persons with physical disabilities and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | House | Published 12-20-2011 |
2011-12-07 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-7-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 98 |
2011-12-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-5-2011 |
2011-11-01 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2011-10-27 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-27-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-09-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2011-09-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-09-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-09-13 | House | Representatives C. Taylor, Williams and Young added as coauthors |
2011-09-13 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2011-09-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-09-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-13 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-09-13 | House | Read a second time |
2011-09-08 | House | Placed on calendar 9-13-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-06-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-06-02 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-06-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-06-02 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Transportation |
2011-06-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-05-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-04-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation |
2011-04-07 | House | Introduced |