WI AB808 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Published 3-25-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Published 3-25-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.35 (1), 125.07 (4) (bs) (intro.) and 125.07 (4) (c) (intro.); and to create 36.35 (4) and 125.07 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting issuance of citations for alcohol beverages violations to certain underage persons in connection with sexual assault or certain other crimes and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions if the underage person is a student.
Title
Prohibiting issuance of citations for alcohol beverages violations to certain underage persons in connection with sexual assault or certain other crimes and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions if the underage person is a student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Published 3-25-2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-24-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 279 |
2016-03-23 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-23-2016 |
2016-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive session held |
2016-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-27 | House | Senator Harris Dodd added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-27 | House | Representatives Spreitzer, Kitchens and Pope added as coauthors |
2016-01-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced |