WI AB804 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.285 (1) (rm) (title), 36.49 (title) and 36.49 (3); and to create 36.49 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: merit scholarships for certain University of Wisconsin System students and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Merit scholarships for certain University of Wisconsin System students and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 314 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 65, Noes 32 |
2018-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative August |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2018-02-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2018-02-01 | House | Representative Anderson withdrawn as a coauthor |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative August |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-12-28 | House | Introduced |