WI AB8 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.44 (3) (c) (intro.) and 45.51 (2) (a) 1.; and to create 36.27 (2) (b) 5., 36.27 (3p) (a) 1r. g., 38.24 (8) (a) 1r. g. and 45.01 (12) (fm) of the statutes; Relating to: expanding veterans benefits to individuals who served in Laos in support of the United States during the Vietnam War.
Title
Expanding veterans benefits to individuals who served in Laos in support of the United States during the Vietnam War.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-03-23 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-02-27 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2023-02-16 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced |