WI AB8 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 301.45 (1p) (a), 938.355 (4m) (b) and 973.015 (1m) (a) 2.; and to create 942.08 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: invading an individual's privacy by viewing under or through clothing and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Invading an individual's privacy by viewing under or through clothing and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Rep. Dana Wachs [D] |
Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. John Nygren [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
Rep. Chris Taylor [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Jill Billings [D] |
Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Nikiya Harris Dodd [D] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 80 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-3-2015 |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-01-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-01-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-01-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-01-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Representatives Young, Johnson and Horlacher added as coauthors |
2015-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table |
2015-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kessler, Subeck, Barnes and Zamarripa |
2015-01-22 | House | Read a second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Senator Harris Dodd withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2015-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-22-2015 by committee on Rules |
2015-01-20 | House | Representative Heaton added as a coauthor |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-01-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced |