WI AB798 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 20.255 (2) (dv) and 115.457 of the statutes; Relating to: an energy efficiency grant program for school districts, funding for the University of Wisconsin System, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
An energy efficiency grant program for school districts, funding for the University of Wisconsin System, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2022-01-04 | House | Introduced |