WI AB798 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 49.45 (24d), 146.78 and 600.01 (1) (b) 13. of the statutes; Relating to: direct primary care program for Medical Assistance recipients and direct primary care agreements. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct primary care program for Medical Assistance recipients and direct primary care agreements. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-12SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20HouseRules suspended
2018-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-20HouseRead a second time
2018-02-15HouseMade a special order of business at 1:45 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
2018-02-15HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-15HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Small Business Development, Ayes 9, Noes 4
2018-02-15HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Small Business Development, Ayes 9, Noes 4
2018-02-07HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-26HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo
2018-01-24HousePublic hearing held
2018-01-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-28HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Small Business Development
2017-12-28HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback