WI AB780 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 59.58 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: county registration of animal-drawn vehicles. (FE)
Title
County registration of animal-drawn vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Dallman [R] | Rep. William Penterman [R] | Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] | Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R] |
Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-10 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2022-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-04 | House | Introduced |