WI AB780 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-19)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Published 4-5-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-19)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Published 4-5-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.38 (5) (b), 48.38 (5) (bm) 1., 48.38 (5m) (b), 48.38 (5m) (c) 1., 48.62 (3), 48.625 (2m), 48.64 (1r) and 118.125 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: notice to a school of a permanency review or hearing, notice to a school district of a foster home or group home license or out-of-home care placement, and transfer of pupil records.
Title
Notice to a school of a permanency review or hearing, notice to a school district of a foster home or group home license or out-of-home care placement, and transfer of pupil records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Published 4-5-2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-4-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 251 |
2018-04-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-3-2018 |
2018-03-05 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-5-2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-13 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rodriguez |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2017-12-27 | House | Introduced |