WI AB779 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Representative Vining added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Representative Vining added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (9) (pq) and 23.199 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a Great Lakes erosion control revolving loan program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a Great Lakes erosion control revolving loan program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced |