WI AB775 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: planning and design of a new engineering building at the University of Wisconsin-Madison. (FE)
Title
Planning and design of a new engineering building at the University of Wisconsin-Madison. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Published 3-19-2022 |
2022-03-18 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-18-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 206 |
2022-03-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 26, Noes 7 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-19 | House | Representatives Stubbs and Hesselbein added as coauthors |
2021-12-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-15 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2021-12-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced |