WI AB775 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Received from Senate concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 48.415 (2) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: the showing of a substantial likelihood that a parent will not meet the conditions established for the safe return of the child to the home in a termination of parental rights proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The showing of a substantial likelihood that a parent will not meet the conditions established for the safe return of the child to the home in a termination of parental rights proceeding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-16SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-14SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-14SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-13HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-13HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended
2018-02-13HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-13HouseRead a second time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-02-07HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-07HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-09HousePublic hearing held
2018-01-08HouseRepresentative Quinn added as a coauthor
2018-01-05HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Family Law
2017-12-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback