WI AB768 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.1201 (22); and to create 66.1201 (22) (a) and 66.1201 (22) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: tax-exempt property of housing authorities. (FE)
Title
Tax-exempt property of housing authorities. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Sen. John Jagler [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 316 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2018-01-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2017-12-19 | House | Introduced |