WI AB765 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: modifying and creating administrative rules to require reimbursement for group physical therapy under the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Title
Modifying and creating administrative rules to require reimbursement for group physical therapy under the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 225 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-11-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-01-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced |