WI AB761 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 238.15 (3) (dm) of the statutes; Relating to: the allocation of unused early stage seed investment credits. (FE)
Title
The allocation of unused early stage seed investment credits. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab761 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB761.pdf |