WI AB76 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 304.078 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: restoration of the right to vote to a person barred from voting as a result of a felony conviction. (FE)
Title
Restoration of the right to vote to a person barred from voting as a result of a felony conviction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-05-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced |