WI AB752 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 177.01 (3) and (4), 177.01 (8) (a) to (c), 177.01 (10) and (11), 177.02, 177.03, 177.04, 177.05, 177.06, 177.07, 177.075, 177.08, 177.10, 177.11, 177.13, 177.14, 177.15, 177.16, 177.17, 177.19, 177.20, 177.21, 177.22, 177.23, 177.24, 177.25, 177.26, 177.265, 177.27, 177.28, 177.29, 177.30 (5), 177.31, 177.32, 177.33, 177.34, 177.35 and 177.36; to renumber 177.015, 177.09, 177.38, 177.40 and 177.41; to renumber and amend 177.01 (6), 177.01 (8) (intro.), 177.01 (12), 177.12, 177.135, 177.165, 177.18, 177.225, 177.255, 177.30 (2), 177.30 (3), 177.30 (4), 177.30 (6), 177.30 (7) and 177.37; to amend 20.437 (2) (qm), 20.566 (4) (j), 62.63 (5), 71.93 (1) (d) 2., 71.93 (3) (a) (intro.), 73.01 (4) (a), 177.01 (1), 177.01 (2), 177.01 (5), 177.01 (7), 177.01 (9), 177.01 (13), 177.01 (15), 177.015 (title), 193.735 (1) (intro.), 193.735 (2), 610.61, 632.63 (4), 863.37 (2) (a), 863.39 (1), 863.39 (3) (a) and 893.95; and to create subchapter I (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.001], 177.001, 177.01 (1d), 177.01 (5d), 177.01 (6) (a) to (d), 177.01 (6d), 177.01 (6f), 177.01 (6g), 177.01 (7b), 177.01 (7d), 177.01 (11d), 177.01 (11f), 177.01 (11g), 177.01 (11j), 177.01 (11m), 177.01 (12) (d), 177.01 (12d), 177.01 (13b), 177.01 (13d), 177.01 (13f), 177.01 (13h), 177.01 (13j), 177.01 (14d), 177.01 (16), 177.01 (17), 177.015 (2), subchapter II (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0201], 177.0201, 177.0202, 177.0203, 177.0204, 177.0205, 177.0207, 177.0208, 177.0210, 177.0211, 177.0212, 177.0214, subchapter III (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0301], 177.0301, 177.0302, 177.0303, 177.0304, 177.0305, 177.0306, 177.0307, 177.0308, subchapter IV (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0401], 177.0401, 177.0402, 177.0403, 177.0404, 177.0405, 177.0406, subchapter V (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0501], 177.0501, 177.0502, 177.0503 (2n), 177.0504, 177.0505, subchapter VI (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0601], 177.0601, 177.0602, 177.0603, 177.0604, 177.0605, 177.0606, 177.0607, 177.0608, 177.0609, 177.0610, subchapter VII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0701], 177.0701, 177.0702, 177.0703, 177.0704, subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0801], 177.0801, 177.0802, 177.0803, subchapter IX (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.0901], 177.0901, 177.0902, 177.0903, 177.0904, 177.0905, 177.0906, subchapter X (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1001], 177.1001, 177.1002 (3), 177.1002 (4), 177.1003, 177.1004, subchapter XI (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1101], 177.1101, 177.1102, 177.1103, 177.1104, subchapter XII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1201], 177.1201, 177.1202, 177.1203, 177.1204, 177.1205, 177.1206, subchapter XIII (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1301], 177.1301, 177.1302, subchapter XIV (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1401], 177.1401, 177.1402, 177.1403, subchapter XV (title) of chapter 177 [precedes 177.1501] and 177.1505 of the statutes; Relating to: the revised uniform unclaimed property act. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The revised uniform unclaimed property act. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-03-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-03-16SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-03-16SenateExecutive action taken
2020-03-11SenatePublic hearing held
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 99, Noes 0
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-19HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative August
2020-02-19HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative August
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:47 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-05HouseLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
2020-01-31HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-31HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2020-01-31HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2020-01-29HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-28HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative August
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-22HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-21HouseRepresentative Tusler added as a coauthor
2020-01-16HouseSenator Smith added as a cosponsor
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative McGuire added as a coauthor
2020-01-16HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback