WI AB752 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-6)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 125.04 (3) (e) 1.; and to create 125.04 (3) (bm), 125.04 (3) (j), 125.04 (6) (g), 134.65 (1r) and 134.65 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: applications for alcohol beverage licenses and permits and for cigarette and tobacco products retailer licenses, appointment of corporate agents of alcohol beverage licensees and permittees, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applications for alcohol beverage licenses and permits and for cigarette and tobacco products retailer licenses, appointment of corporate agents of alcohol beverage licensees and permittees, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HousePublished 4-17-2018
2018-04-17HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 289
2018-04-12HousePresented to the Governor on 4-12-2018
2018-03-29HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-03-01SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-01SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-03-01SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-30SenatePublic hearing held
2018-01-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations
2018-01-23SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-01-23HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-23HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-01-23HouseRules suspended
2018-01-23HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-23HouseRead a second time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-01-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-01-18HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2018-01-17HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-10HousePublic hearing held
2017-12-21HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-21HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-19HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
2017-12-19HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback