WI AB752 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 15.49; and to create 15.49 (2) and 15.49 (3) of the statutes; relating to: members of the Board of Veterans Affairs and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Members of the Board of Veterans Affairs and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 88, Noes 10 | |
2010-04-20 | Refused to indefinitely postpone, Ayes 10, Noes 88 | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-15 | Made a special order of business at 11:10 A.M. on 4-20-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-12 | Report passage recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 2 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-09 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab752 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB752.pdf |