WI AB751 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.52 (13) and 77.53 (10); and to create 77.54 (69) of the statutes; Relating to: sales and use tax exemption for diapers, undergarments for incontinence, tampons, and sanitary napkins. (FE)
Title
Sales and use tax exemption for diapers, undergarments for incontinence, tampons, and sanitary napkins. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-25 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-17 | House | Representative Hintz added as a coauthor |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab751 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB751.pdf |