WI AB75 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 961.55 (8) and 968.19; to amend 59.54 (25) (a) (intro.), 59.54 (25m), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 66.0107 (1) (bp), 66.1201 (2m), 66.1213 (3), 66.1301 (2m), 66.1331 (2m), 66.1333 (3) (e) 2., 106.50 (1m) (h), 234.29, 289.33 (3) (d), 349.02 (2) (b) 4., 767.41 (5) (am) (intro.), 767.451 (5m) (a), 961.555 (2) (a), 961.56 (1) and 968.20 (1g) (intro.); and to create 20.435 (1) (gq), 20.435 (1) (jm), subchapter IV of chapter 50 [precedes 50.59], 59.54 (25) (c), 66.0414, 146.44, 767.41 (5) (d), 767.451 (5m) (d), 961.01 (3), 961.01 (5m), 961.01 (11v), 961.01 (12v), 961.01 (14c), 961.01 (14g), 961.01 (17k), 961.01 (19m), 961.01 (20hm), 961.01 (20ht), 961.01 (20t), 961.01 (21f), 961.01 (21t), 961.436, 961.55 (8) (b), 961.55 (8) (c), 961.55 (8) (d), 961.555 (2) (e), 961.555 (2m), 961.5755, 968.072, 968.12 (6), 968.19 (2) and 968.20 (1j) of the statutes; Relating to: medical use of marijuana, the regulation of marijuana distribution entities, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical use of marijuana, the regulation of marijuana distribution entities, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-22HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-02HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-02-20HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback