WI AB748 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 98.146 (2); and to amend 98.146 (1) and 98.146 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: reciprocity for bulk milk weighing and sampling licenses. (FE)
Title
Reciprocity for bulk milk weighing and sampling licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:46 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab748 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB748.pdf |