WI AB748 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.30 (1s) (b) and 119.23 (7) (f); to renumber 118.60 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 118.30 (1s) (a), 118.60 (7) (ad), 119.23 (7) (ad) and 895.035 (1) (a); to amend 7.30 (2) (am), 48.355 (2) (c), 118.07 (3), 118.30 (2) (b) 5., 118.33 (1) (f) 3., 118.33 (6) (c) 1., 118.33 (6) (c) 2., 118.60 (1) (c), 118.60 (2) (a) (intro.), 118.60 (2) (a) 3. a., 118.60 (7) (em) 1., 118.60 (9), 118.60 (10) (am) 2., 118.60 (10) (ar), 119.23 (1) (am), 119.23 (2) (a) (intro.), 119.23 (2) (a) 3., 119.23 (2) (a) 7. a., 119.23 (2) (a) 7. c., 119.23 (2) (a) 7. d., 119.23 (7) (em) 1., 119.23 (9), 119.23 (10) (am) 2., 119.23 (10) (ar), 447.06 (2) (a) 2. and 950.08 (2w); to repeal and recreate 118.60 (2) (a) 7. and 119.23 (2) (a) 7. b.; and to create 39.41 (1) (aj), 115.001 (3d), 118.60 (1) (ab), 118.60 (1) (af), 118.60 (1) (bn), 118.60 (1) (cm), 118.60 (2) (a) 3g., 118.60 (2) (ag), 118.60 (2) (ar), 118.60 (7) (ad) 1. and 2., 118.60 (7) (ag), 118.60 (7) (ao), 119.23 (1) (ab), 119.23 (1) (af), 119.23 (1) (ai), 119.23 (1) (ap), 119.23 (2) (a) 3g., 119.23 (2) (a) 7. bg. and br., 119.23 (2) (a) 7. e., 119.23 (2) (ag), 119.23 (2) (ar), 119.23 (7) (ad) 1. and 2., 119.23 (7) (ag), 119.23 (7) (ao), 895.035 (1) (a) 2. and 938.02 (6m) of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for new private schools seeking to participate in a parental choice program and requiring a private school participating in a parental choice program to maintain accreditation. (FE)
Title
Requirements for new private schools seeking to participate in a parental choice program and requiring a private school participating in a parental choice program to maintain accreditation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R] | Rep. Jim Steineke [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab748 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB748.pdf |