WI AB745 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.20 (2g) (a) (intro.); and to repeal and recreate 97.20 (2g) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: milk procurement fees.
Title
Milk procurement fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 303 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative Jorgensen added as a coauthor |
2014-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:06 AM on 2-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 25 |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 2 |
2014-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced |