WI AB744 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 631.36 (4) (b); and to create 628.34 (14) and 631.39 of the statutes; Relating to: insurance policy renewal in an affiliate and the use and contents of certificates of insurance.
Title
Insurance policy renewal in an affiliate and the use and contents of certificates of insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 241 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2018-01-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-12-13 | House | Introduced |