WI AB741 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 973.017 (2) (b); and to create 973.017 (8m) of the statutes; Relating to: considering post-traumatic stress disorder as a mitigating factor in sentencing certain criminal offenders. (FE)
Title
Considering post-traumatic stress disorder as a mitigating factor in sentencing certain criminal offenders. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-12-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab741 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB741.pdf |